This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2023 at 12:28:02 (UTC).

JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER VS PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC, A CONNECTICUT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/04/2023 JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC, A CONNECTICUT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0075

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEBBER JEFFREY BLAKE

Defendant

PROPARK AMERICA WEST LLC A CONNECTICUT LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES ROSS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/4/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/4/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/4/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/4/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/4/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/4/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

7/10/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER on 05/04/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER (Plaintiff); As to: PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC, a Connecticut Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Date: 06/13/2023; Service Cost: 238.04; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER (Plaintiff); As to: PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC, a Connecticut Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER (Plaintiff); As to: PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC, a Connecticut Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: JEFFREY BLAKE WEBBER (Plaintiff); As to: PROPARK AMERICA WEST, LLC, a Connecticut Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less