This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/08/2023 at 02:33:44 (UTC).

EDUAR MITCHELL VS MANAGEMENT & TRAINING CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 EDUAR MITCHELL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against MANAGEMENT TRAINING CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0062

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MITCHELL EDUAR

Defendant

MANAGEMENT & TRAINING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAWKINS JAMES R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/5/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/5/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/5/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Initial Status Conference Order

5/22/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/22/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

5/22/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/22/2023, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/22/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

6/9/2023: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/12/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

6/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Status Report - NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW STATUS REPORT

8/25/2023: Status Report - NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW STATUS REPORT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FEDERAL COURT REMAND)

9/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FEDERAL COURT REMAND)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FEDERAL COURT REMAND) OF 09/08/2023

9/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FEDERAL COURT REMAND) OF 09/08/2023

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 updated: Result Date to 09/08/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand) of 09/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Status Report; Filed by: Eduar Mitchell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice to Superior Court of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court: Filed By: Management & Training Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Federal Court Remand scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Eduar Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Management & Training Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Highberger in Department 10 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Eduar Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Management & Training Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Eduar Mitchell (Plaintiff); As to: Management & Training Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less