This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/12/2023 at 05:08:55 (UTC).

HEATH FARRELL VS VICTOR GUDINO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 HEATH FARRELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VICTOR GUDINO,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VALERIE SALKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1973

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VALERIE SALKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FARRELL HEATH

Defendants

GUDINO VICTOR

PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CORPORATION

SMARDEN-HATCHER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDERSON MARC DONALD

QUIRK TREVOR MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

CHERMELA JASON R.

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Leonidas Nicol

9/5/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Leonidas Nicol

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

9/5/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Ruling

9/5/2023: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

8/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

6/30/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

6/28/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/28/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/28/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/2/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

6/2/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/5/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/5/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

5/5/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/25/2024

Hearing01/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketDeclaration of Leonidas Nicol; Filed by: Heath Farrell (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Victor Gudino (Defendant); Smarden-Hatcher Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/25/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Victor Gudino (Defendant); Smarden-Hatcher Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Heath Farrell (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Heath Farrell on 05/05/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Heath Farrell as to Penske Truck Leasing Corporation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/30/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Heath Farrell (Plaintiff); As to: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Victor Gudino (Defendant); Smarden-Hatcher Company (Defendant); As to: Heath Farrell (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
05/09/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/09/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Heath Farrell (Plaintiff); As to: Victor Gudino (Defendant); Smarden-Hatcher Company (Defendant); Penske Truck Leasing Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Heath Farrell (Plaintiff); As to: Victor Gudino (Defendant); Smarden-Hatcher Company (Defendant); Penske Truck Leasing Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Heath Farrell (Plaintiff); As to: Victor Gudino (Defendant); Smarden-Hatcher Company (Defendant); Penske Truck Leasing Corporation (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/05/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

[+] Read More [-] Read Less