This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 11:25:42 (UTC).

BRIAN WHITAKER VS TACOS 1986 GROUP LLC

Case Summary

On 05/18/2023 BRIAN WHITAKER filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TACOS 1986 GROUP LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1171

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITAKER BRIAN

Defendant

TACOS 1986 GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POTTER MARK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/18/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/18/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/18/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

5/18/2023: Clerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/18/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/27/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/11/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/14/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Case Management Statement

8/29/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/5/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/6/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2023
  • Hearing09/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Filed By: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); Result: Not Entered ; Result Date: 09/06/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Tacos 1986 Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant) to Tacos 1986 Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Tacos 1986 Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2023
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Tacos 1986 Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; On the Complaint filed by Brian Whitaker on 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Tacos 1986 Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Tacos 1986 Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company; On the Complaint filed by Brian Whitaker on 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Tacos 1986 Group LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 40.00; Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketAddress for Mark Potter (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Tacos 1986 Group LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Tacos 1986 Group LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Brian Whitaker (Plaintiff); As to: Tacos 1986 Group LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Full Payment of Fees Required; Filed by: Clerk; As to: Mark Dee Potter (Attorney)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Timothy Patrick Dillon in Department 73 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less