This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 01:34:06 (UTC).

ARIK CHOWDHURY VS CC SITE ONE LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2023 ARIK CHOWDHURY filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against CC SITE ONE LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE W. MANDEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1281

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELAINE W. MANDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHOWDHURY ARIK

Defendants

CC SITE ONE LLC

OG INDUSTRIES LLC

TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEKARCHIAN HALEH

Defendant Attorney

POKLADOWSKI THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/23/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/23/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/23/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

3/23/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

3/23/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/4/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/4/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

6/20/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

7/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

7/6/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/20/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

7/20/2023: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Proof of Personal Service

7/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2023
  • Hearing10/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: ARIK CHOWDHURY (Plaintiff); As to: TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Date: 06/21/2023; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Haleh Shekarchian (Attorney): First Name changed from HALEH to Haleh; Last Name changed from SHEKARCHIAN to Shekarchian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketAddress for Haleh Shekarchian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Held - Continued was rescheduled to 10/19/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P updated: Result Date to 07/21/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: CC SITE ONE LLC (Defendant); As to: ARIK CHOWDHURY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: CC SITE ONE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: CC SITE ONE LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/21/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ARIK CHOWDHURY (Plaintiff); As to: CC SITE ONE LLC (Defendant); TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION (Defendant); OG INDUSTRIES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ARIK CHOWDHURY (Plaintiff); As to: CC SITE ONE LLC (Defendant); TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION (Defendant); OG INDUSTRIES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ARIK CHOWDHURY (Plaintiff); As to: CC SITE ONE LLC (Defendant); TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION (Defendant); OG INDUSTRIES, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less