This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2023 at 02:01:03 (UTC).

LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. VS MW RESIDENTIAL SOCAL CORP, A COLORADO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/14/2023 LMT ENTERPRISES, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MW RESIDENTIAL SOCAL CORP, A COLORADO CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARY Y. TANAKA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2279

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARY Y. TANAKA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LMT ENTERPRISES INC. DBA TYNER PAVING CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

INGLEWOOD MARKET GATEWAY LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MILENDER WHITE INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION

MW RESIDENTIAL SOCAL CORP A COLORADO CORPORATION

ST MARKET D3 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDMAN BRUCE

Defendant Attorney

GOODKIN DANIEL LOUIS

 

Court Documents

Answer ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

11/6/2023: Answer ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling

10/11/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Fai...)

10/10/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Fai...)

Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Partial

9/28/2023: Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Partial

Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Partial

9/28/2023: Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Partial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/28/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

9/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/5/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

7/20/2023: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/14/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/14/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/14/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

7/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

Complaint COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC’S LIEN 3. FORECLOSURE ON MECHANIC’S LIEN RELEASE BOND; 4. QUANTUM MERUIT; and 5. ACCOUNT STATED

7/14/2023: Complaint COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. FORECLOSURE OF MECHANIC’S LIEN 3. FORECLOSURE ON MECHANIC’S LIEN RELEASE BOND; 4. QUANTUM MERUIT; and 5. ACCOUNT STATED

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/14/2023

Hearing12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/06/2023

DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT; Filed by: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant); As to: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant); Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 93.50; Service Date: 10/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2023

DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Fai...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B updated: Result Date to 10/10/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2023

DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/14/2023 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal Partial; Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: ST MARKET D3, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal Partial; Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: INGLEWOOD MARKET GATEWAY, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant); Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
07/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MW RESIDENTIAL SOCAL CORP, a Colorado corporation (Defendant); MILENDER WHITE, INC., a Colorado corporation (Defendant); INGLEWOOD MARKET GATEWAY, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. FORECLOSURE OF MECHANICS LIEN 3. FORECLOSURE ON MECHANICS LIEN RELEASE BOND; 4. QUANTUM MERUIT; and 5. ACCOUNT STATED; Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MW RESIDENTIAL SOCAL CORP, a Colorado corporation (Defendant); MILENDER WHITE, INC., a Colorado corporation (Defendant); INGLEWOOD MARKET GATEWAY, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet and Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: LMT ENTERPRISES, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: MW RESIDENTIAL SOCAL CORP, a Colorado corporation (Defendant); MILENDER WHITE, INC., a Colorado corporation (Defendant); INGLEWOOD MARKET GATEWAY, LLC., a California limited liability company (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less