This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2023 at 12:20:22 (UTC).

JARROD TY MORI, ET AL. VS MADISON LAMOTHE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 JARROD TY MORI, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MADISON LAMOTHE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2325

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MORI JARROD TY

MORI JOY MARIE

Defendants

LAMOTHE MADISON

LOUGHRAM-LAMOTHE LAURIE K.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMPION KIARASH SHAMLOO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - BY AND THROUGH

5/31/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - BY AND THROUGH

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/28/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2023
  • Hearing11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jarrod Ty Mori (Plaintiff); Joy Marie Mori (Plaintiff); Jaylin Mori (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem by and through: Exact Name: blank ; As To Parties changed from Madison Lamothe (Defendant), Laurie K. Loughram-Lamothe (Defendant) to Madison Lamothe (Defendant), Laurie K. Loughram-Lamothe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • Docketby and through; Signed and Filed by: Jarrod Ty Mori (Plaintiff); Joy Marie Mori (Plaintiff); Jaylin Mori (Plaintiff); As to: Madison Lamothe (Defendant); Laurie K. Loughram-Lamothe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- by and through: Filed By: Jarrod Ty Mori (Plaintiff),Joy Marie Mori (Plaintiff),Jaylin Mori (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- by and through: Status Date changed from 05/31/2023 to 05/31/2023 ; Name Extension: by and through ; Result Date changed from 05/31/2023 to 05/31/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Madison Lamothe (Defendant), Laurie K. Loughram-Lamothe (Defendant) to Madison Lamothe (Defendant), Laurie K. Loughram-Lamothe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. H. Jay Ford III in Department O Santa Monica Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jarrod Ty Mori (Plaintiff); Joy Marie Mori (Plaintiff); Jaylin Mori (Plaintiff); As to: Madison Lamothe (Defendant); Laurie K. Loughram-Lamothe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jarrod Ty Mori (Plaintiff); Joy Marie Mori (Plaintiff); Jaylin Mori (Plaintiff); As to: Madison Lamothe (Defendant); Laurie K. Loughram-Lamothe (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less