This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/24/2023 at 09:22:34 (UTC).

YANG, YUJIE VS KANG, HONGYI

Case Summary

On 07/20/2023 YANG, YUJIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KANG, HONGYI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1193

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

YANG YUJIE

Respondent

KANG HONGYI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

VALDEZ JEREMIAH FLORES

 

Court Documents

Summons

7/20/2023: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

7/20/2023: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Notice - Case Assignment

7/20/2023: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

7/20/2023: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

7/20/2023: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Proof of Service of Summons

8/31/2023: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

08/31/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketSummons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketNotice - Case Assignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

[+] Read More [-] Read Less