This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2023 at 07:27:15 (UTC).

UMLAS, ERIKA VELASCO VS SANTIAGO, ELMAR VALENCIA

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 UMLAS, ERIKA VELASCO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANTIAGO, ELMAR VALENCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5255

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UMLAS ERIKA VELASCO

Respondent

SANTIAGO ELMAR VALENCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BALDOMERO MARLON BRADLEY

 

Court Documents

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

5/17/2023: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/17/2023: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 - Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/17/2023: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child - Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons - Summons

5/17/2023: Summons - Summons

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

5/18/2023: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

8/31/2023: Proof of Service of Summons - Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

08/31/2023

DocketProof of Service of Summons (Proof of Service of Summons )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketNotice - Status Conference Review: Proof of Service (Noticed by LASC )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketSummons (Summons ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child (Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/17/2023

DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 (Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020 ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less