This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 04:05:19 (UTC).

RUTH LIEN MARTINEZ MOJICA VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 09/19/2023 RUTH LIEN MARTINEZ MOJICA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4159

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOJICA RUTH LIEN MARTINEZ

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SADGAN LIOR

Defendant Attorney

HAIRAPETIAN ARMEN

 

Court Documents

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/19/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/19/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/19/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/19/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/19/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/19/2023: Complaint

Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

9/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/20/2023

9/20/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/20/2023

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

10/26/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

01/18/2024

Hearing01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Ruth Lien Martinez Mojica (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/28/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ruth Lien Martinez Mojica (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 09/26/2023; Service Cost: 41.18; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Virginia Keeny in Department W Van Nuys Courthouse East

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 09/20/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department W

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ruth Lien Martinez Mojica (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ruth Lien Martinez Mojica (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ruth Lien Martinez Mojica (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less