This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2023 at 04:07:59 (UTC).

JENNIFER ILSE HERNANDEZ, ET AL. VS LOS FELIZ HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2023 JENNIFER ILSE HERNANDEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LOS FELIZ HEALTHCARE WELLNESS CENTRE, LP,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6694

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER ILSE HERNANDEZ

Defendants

COUNTRY VILLA LOS FELIZ NURSING CENTER

LOS FELIZ HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE LP DBA COUNTRY VILLA LOS FELIZ NURSING CENTER A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

LOS FELIZ WELLNESS GP LLC

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

ROCKPORT HEALTHCARE SERVICES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEREPINSKIY DMITRIY

Defendant Attorney

EKPEBE VONA S.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/17/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

7/17/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Jennifer Ilse Hernandez as Successor-in-Interest Pursuant to CCP section 377.32

7/17/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Plaintiff Jennifer Ilse Hernandez as Successor-in-Interest Pursuant to CCP section 377.32

Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

7/17/2023: Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

7/17/2023: Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/17/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/17/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

9/27/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

07/14/2025

Hearing07/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2025

Hearing01/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2024

Hearing12/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Los Feliz Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); Rockport Administrative Services, LLC (Defendant); As to: Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Los Feliz Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/24/2023; Service Cost: 90.85; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Rockport Administrative Services, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/28/2023; Service Cost: 90.85; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/30/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/13/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/14/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Los Feliz Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); Country Villa Los Feliz Nursing Center (Defendant); Los Feliz Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Los Feliz Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); Country Villa Los Feliz Nursing Center (Defendant); Los Feliz Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Los Feliz Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); Country Villa Los Feliz Nursing Center (Defendant); Los Feliz Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketDeclaration Declaration of Plaintiff Jennifer Ilse Hernandez as Successor-in-Interest Pursuant to CCP section 377.32; Filed by: Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); Jennifer Ilse Hernandez (Plaintiff); As to: Los Feliz Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LP (Defendant); Country Villa Los Feliz Nursing Center (Defendant); Los Feliz Wellness GP, LLC (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/17/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less