This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2023 at 10:29:10 (UTC).

ARIANNA DAVIS, ET AL. VS BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/01/2023 ARIANNA DAVIS, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3553

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS ARIANNA

RODRIGUEZ NOELLE

WILLIAMS CRYSTAL

Defendants

BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING INC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

JEFFERSON PKA LIZZO MELISSA

QUIGLEY SHIRLENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZAMBRANO RONALD L.

Defendant Attorneys

MACELLARO THERESA J

LERNER MELISSA YAFFA

 

Court Documents

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

11/27/2023: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

11/22/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

11/22/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Alishia Williams In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Alishia Williams In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Alaini Walker In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Alaini Walker In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Jayla Sullivan In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Jayla Sullivan In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Doshiniq Green In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Doshiniq Green In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Shirlene Quigley In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Shirlene Quigley In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Ashley Joshi In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Ashley Joshi In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Objection (name extension) Objection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ARIANNA DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/15/2023: Objection (name extension) Objection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ARIANNA DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Objection (name extension) Objection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CRYSTAL WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/15/2023: Objection (name extension) Objection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CRYSTAL WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Reply (name extension) Reply In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16

11/15/2023: Reply (name extension) Reply In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Complaint Pursuant To Cal. Civ. Proc. Code 425.16

Objection (name extension) Objection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF NOELLE RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/15/2023: Objection (name extension) Objection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF NOELLE RODRIGUEZ IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Ashley Williams In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Ashley Williams In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Asia Banks In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Asia Banks In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Dallas Greene In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Dallas Greene In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order

Response (name extension) Response RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ZURI APPLEBY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF ZURI APPLEBY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Response (name extension) Response RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF TANISHA SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

11/15/2023: Response (name extension) Response RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF TANISHA SCOTT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

88 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

01/26/2024

Hearing01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department I at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2024

Hearing01/02/2024 at 09:00 AM in Department I at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion - Other Lift Stay of Discovery

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/04/2023

Hearing12/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department I at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketHearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/27/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department I Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/04/2023 09:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by: MELISSA JEFFERSON (pka LIZZO), (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketObjection EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATION OF CRYSTAL WILLIAMS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Filed by: BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MELISSA JEFFERSON (pka LIZZO), (Defendant); SHIRLENE QUIGLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketResponse Response To Plaintiffs Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Ashley Williams In Support Of Defendants Special Motion To Strike; [Proposed] Order; Filed by: BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MELISSA JEFFERSON (pka LIZZO), (Defendant); SHIRLENE QUIGLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
View All Docket Entries
08/03/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark H. Epstein in Department R Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department R

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: ARIANNA DAVIS (Plaintiff); CRYSTAL WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); NOELLE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MELISSA JEFFERSON (pka LIZZO), (Defendant); SHIRLENE QUIGLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ARIANNA DAVIS (Plaintiff); CRYSTAL WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); NOELLE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MELISSA JEFFERSON (pka LIZZO), (Defendant); SHIRLENE QUIGLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ARIANNA DAVIS (Plaintiff); CRYSTAL WILLIAMS (Plaintiff); NOELLE RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: BIG GRRRL BIG TOURING, INC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MELISSA JEFFERSON (pka LIZZO), (Defendant); SHIRLENE QUIGLEY (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******3553 Hearing Date: December 4, 2023 Dept: I

This is hear on a non-appearance to ensure that the supplemental papers were received. The court will decide shortly if more argument is needed and, if so, will set a date. If not, the court will deem the matter submitted and rule from chambers. There will be no hearing today.




Case Number: *******3553 Hearing Date: November 22, 2023 Dept: I

In preparation for the hearing today, the court poses the following questions that the parties might want to address.

Is it Lizzo's position that due to her celebrity status, anything she does is a matter of public interest?

How far does the constitutional protection for expressive conduct extend? Does it extend to social events with the dance crew? Does it extend to the allegations of false imprisonment or assault? (FilmOn.com Inc. v. DoubleVerify Inc (2019) 7 Cal.5th 133; Tamkin v. CBS Broadcasting, Inc. (2011) 193 Cal.App.4th 133; Hall v. Time Warner, Inc. (2007) 153 Cal.App.4th 1337.)

If participation in an event is encouraged but not required, and if that event (such as the prayer circle) is religion-based, can that be viewed as a condition of employment or the basis of a FEHA claim?

In the context of the "soft hold," do plaintiffs contend that such a soft hold is per se unlawful?

In the context of the "soft hold," have plaintiffs identified any specific job opportunity that any of them had to pass up due to the soft hold (other than the one instance Rodriguez mentions)?

While the court recognizes that the severity of the effect of the alleged misconduct can, in an appropriate case, give rise to summary judgment, is that a question that can really be decided before any discovery has been taken? In other words, what quantum of evidence other than a witnesses own subjective view could be garnered at this stage of the proceedings to resolve that question in a way that comports with due process?

Discuss the law relating to sexual harassment under FEHA in light of Lyle v. Warner Brothers Television Productions (2006) 38 Cal.4th 264. More specifically, that case seemed to hold-in a 7-0 decision-that even sexual harassment had a requirement that the plaintiff prove that she was treated differently than persons of another gender. Thus, even if there was conduct that could be viewed as harassment more broadly, can it form the basis of a FEHA claim if there is no evidence that male employees were treated differently? Put another way, does Lyle hold that even if there is a hostile work environment due to conduct that (if it occurred) could be viewed as harassing, it is nonetheless outside FEHA's scope if the harassing conduct was directed to everyone rather than only to members of a particular sex or gender? If not, how do plaintiffs overcome what appears to be pretty specific language in Lyle imposing such a requirement. If so, what is the evidence that males were not subjected to the same or similar behavior? (In this regard, the court is focused more on the nude photo shoot than the Amsterdam or Paris issues.)

What, if any, weight should the court give to statements made after a plaintiff was terminated or quit?

What is plaintiffs' strongest evidence of harassment and discrimination (sexual, racial, religious, and disability)? What is plaintiffs' strongest evidence that such conduct was sufficiently severe so as to create a hostile working environment?

What, if any, weight should be put on the claim that plaintiffs failed to approach management concerning the alleged sexual, racial, or religious misconduct?

The court does not mean to limit the argument, but these are some of the topics with which the court is grappling. The parties are free to address these and other topics at the hearing.




Case Number: *******3553 Hearing Date: November 3, 2023 Dept: I

The matter is here on two ex parte applications brought by plaintiffs. One is to file an over-length brief and the other is for an order shortening time on their motion to lift the discovery stay in whole or in part. Both applications are DENIED.

The court will not turn this application into a mini-hearing on the merits of the Special Motion to Strike (SMS) currently set for November 22, 2023-the day before Thanksgiving. The court does, however, set forth a few things that apply to both motions. A SMS has two prongs. The first goes to whether the complaint alleges liability based on defendants' exercise of certain constitutional rights. The burden on this prong is on the moving party. It is generally resolved by the pleadings, but the court can look beyond the pleadings primarily for context and understanding. If the first prong is met, then plaintiffs must address the second prong, which is whether they have established "a probability" that they "will prevail" on their claim. Notwithstanding that language, however, plaintiffs real burden is only to show "minimal merit," meaning that there is a triable issue of fact as to whether they will prevail, similar to what they would have to show to defeat a summary judgment motion. The Legislature has determined that where a cause of action alleges liability based on a defendant's exercise of applicable constitutional rights, the plaintiff must have the evidence in hand before filing suit; a discovery stay is imposed automatically when the SMS is filed. However, for "good cause," the court may allow targeted discovery in appropriate cases.

With that general overview in mind, the court turns to the two applications. The first goes to the page limit. Defendants were able to file a brief within the 15 page confines. True, they had a ton of extrinsic evidence in the form of declarations, but the legal brief was only 15 pages. It discussed the law and it discussed the facts. Plaintiffs have not shown why they cannot do the same. They note that they will need to address 7 cases. But that is hardly an avalanche of authority, and not all cases need to be addressed exhaustively. For now, plaintiffs have not made their showing. If the court, upon reading the opposition, concludes that plaintiffs in fact did need more pages, it will entertain a request at the hearing for a continuance and to allow supplemental briefing. It goes without saying (which is always a prelude to someone saying it anyway) that defendants ought not request leave to file an overlength reply. The request to file the overlength brief is therefore DENIED.

That leads to the OST as to the discovery stay. As a practical matter, if the OST is denied, so is the underlying motion, which is not set to be heard until after the SMS hearing. The court is therefore aware that a denial of the OST is a denial of the merits.

Plaintiffs bear the burden of showing good cause to take discovery. They make two arguments. The first is that they need to depose certain people to delve into what the "creative expression" is that undergirds the motion. As set forth above, that goes to the first prong, which is based to a very large extent on the allegations. To the extent that there is doubt on the subject, it is generally resolved in the moving party's favor. The court does not see a particularized need for discovery on this point. The second relates to depositions of the various declarants. But plaintiffs there mis-perceive their burden. This goes to the second prong. Doubts there are resolved against the moving party. Were the court allowed to weigh the evidence and make a determination based thereon, plaintiffs would have a good case. And such motions are not rare. Motions for preliminary injunctions, motions to expunge a lis pendens, and motions to obtain attachments, are all motions where the court can weigh the evidence. Were this also such a motion, the court would agree that it would be necessary to depose the various declarants. But it is not. Plaintiffs need only establish "minimal merit," that is, a triable issue of fact. The court has read the underlying motion and does not see that any good cause has been established to lift the discovery stay. Moreover, while plaintiffs contend that the discovery they seek is "very limited," in the same sentence they say that they need to take 21 depositions. That is not "very limited." If the court is otherwise inclined to grant the SMS, the court will entertain discussion at the hearing that discovery was needed to give plaintiffs the ammunition needed to defeat the SMS and will consider continuing the hearing to allow such laser-beam discovery. However, plaintiffs will need to make a far stronger showing than they have done to date to obtain that relief given the actual burden that they must carry to defeat the SMS. Accordingly, the application to lift the stay is DENIED.