This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2023 at 07:10:04 (UTC).

TAHIRA WASHINGTON, ET AL. VS JOSELINO MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 04/17/2023 TAHIRA WASHINGTON, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOSELINO MARTINEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1117

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MASAI PRICE BY AND THROUGH THEIR GUARDIAN AD LITEM TAHIRA WASHINGTON

RAJAH WASHINGTON BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEM TAHIRA WASHINGTON

WASHINGTON TAHIRA

NAIIM SPRATT BY AND THROUGH THEIR GUARDIAN AD LITEM TAHIRA WASHINGTON

Defendant

MARTINEZ JOSELINO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLEITMAN JEFFREY P.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/17/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/17/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/17/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/17/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/17/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/17/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/18/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/18/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/12/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Amended Complaint

6/26/2023: Amended Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/5/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/5/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/5/2023: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • Hearing09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department K at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Rajah Washington by and through his guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); As to: Rajah Washington by and through his guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Rajah Washington by and through his guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Naiim Spratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); As to: Naiim Spratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Naim Pratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Masai Price by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); As to: Masai Price by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Masai Price by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/05/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Naiim Spratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Naim Pratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington to Naiim Spratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Rajah Washington by and through his guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Naim Pratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Masai Price by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); As to: Joselino Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wesley L. Hsu in Department L Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Rajah Washington by and through his guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Naim Pratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Masai Price by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); As to: Joselino Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Rajah Washington by and through his guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Naim Pratt by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); Masai Price by and through their guardian ad litem Tahira Washington (Plaintiff); As to: Joselino Martinez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less