This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2023 at 02:41:53 (UTC).

SUMAYYA AASI, ET AL. VS AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 SUMAYYA AASI, filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1193

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AASI HUMA

AASI SUMAYYA

Defendant

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRNOS ROGER

Defendant Attorney

SADANAGA ARIANE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/25/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/25/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/25/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Demand for Jury Trial

5/25/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/25/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/25/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/26/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/26/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/25/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Proof of Personal Service

6/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARIANE SADANAGA PER CCP 430.41(A)(2)

7/24/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ARIANE SADANAGA PER CCP 430.41(A)(2)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/27/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

7/27/2023: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION TO STRIKE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2023
  • Hearing10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Motion to Strike; Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Motion to Strike: As To Parties: SUMAYYA AASI (Plaintiff), HUMA AASI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10): As To Parties: SUMAYYA AASI (Plaintiff), HUMA AASI (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2023
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 10/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Ariane Sadanaga PER CCP 430.41(a)(2); Filed by: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: SUMAYYA AASI (Plaintiff); HUMA AASI (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SUMAYYA AASI (Plaintiff); HUMA AASI (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SUMAYYA AASI (Plaintiff); HUMA AASI (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: SUMAYYA AASI (Plaintiff); HUMA AASI (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SUMAYYA AASI (Plaintiff); HUMA AASI (Plaintiff); As to: AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO., INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less