This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2023 at 11:04:43 (UTC).

GUESS, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL. VS NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2023 GUESS, INC , A CORPORATION, filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0331

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALBERINI CARLOS

CHIDONI ANTHONY

GUESS INC.

LIVINGSTON CYNTHIA

MARCIANO MAURICE

MARCIANO PAUL

Defendants

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLIED WORLD SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

BEAZLEY USA SERVICES INC.

HUDSON INSURANCE COMPANY

LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC.

NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

OLD REPUBLIC INSURANCE COMPANY

RLI INSURANCE COMPANY

ST. PAUL TRAVELERS

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY

U.S. SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS NAV 1221/5321 AND BRIT 2987/5365

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'HANLON MATTHEW B.

SCHACK DAVID P.

Defendant Attorney

KIEFFER KEVIN FOMASI

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

8/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT;

7/28/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT;

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL O...) OF 07/11/2023

7/11/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL O...) OF 07/11/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN F. KIEFFER ISO OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

7/11/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KEVIN F. KIEFFER ISO OF PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL O...)

7/11/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL O...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

7/10/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

7/10/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

7/10/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; ORDER THEREON

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 170.6 AGAINST JUDGE THOMAS D. LONG

7/7/2023: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 170.6 AGAINST JUDGE THOMAS D. LONG

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND...)

7/5/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND...)

Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND CIVIL CASE COVERSHEETS

6/30/2023: Notice of OSC - NOTICE OF OSC (NAME EXTENSION) NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND CIVIL CASE COVERSHEETS

Proof of Service by Mail

6/28/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 06/27/2023

6/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER) OF 06/27/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

6/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND CIVIL C...)

6/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND CIVIL C...)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND CIVIL C...) OF 06/26/2023

6/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: COMPLEX CIVIL CASE QUESTIONNAIRES AND CIVIL C...) OF 06/26/2023

Complex Civil Case Questionnaire

6/26/2023: Complex Civil Case Questionnaire

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/18/2023 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 15 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 08/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketNotice OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON STIPULATION RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; Filed by: LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS INC. (Defendant); As to: Guess, Inc. (Plaintiff); Paul Marciano (Plaintiff); Maurice Marciano (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT;; Signed and Filed by: Guess, Inc. (Plaintiff); Paul Marciano (Plaintiff); Maurice Marciano (Plaintiff); Alex Yemenidjian (Plaintiff); Carlos Alberini (Plaintiff); Cynthia Livingston (Plaintiff); Anthony Chidoni (Plaintiff); Deborah Weinswig (Plaintiff); As to: NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 170.6 AGAINST JUDGE THOMAS D. LONG: Result Date changed from 07/10/2023 to 07/11/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 15 - Hon. Richard L. Fruin; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Kevin F. Kieffer ISO of Peremptory Challenge; Filed by: BEAZLEY USA SERVICES, INC. (Defendant); As to: Guess, Inc. (Plaintiff); Paul Marciano (Plaintiff); Maurice Marciano (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL O...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (COURT ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL O...) of 07/11/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- DEFENDANT'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 170.6 AGAINST JUDGE THOMAS D. LONG: Result Date changed from 07/11/2023 to 07/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketAddress for David P. Schack (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 48

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Guess, Inc. (Plaintiff); Paul Marciano (Plaintiff); Maurice Marciano (Plaintiff); Alex Yemenidjian (Plaintiff); Carlos Alberini (Plaintiff); Cynthia Livingston (Plaintiff); Anthony Chidoni (Plaintiff); Deborah Weinswig (Plaintiff); As to: NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Guess, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); Paul Marciano (Plaintiff); Maurice Marciano (Plaintiff); Alex Yemenidjian (Plaintiff); Carlos Alberini (Plaintiff); Cynthia Livingston (Plaintiff); Anthony Chidoni (Plaintiff); Deborah Weinswig (Plaintiff); As to: NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guess, Inc., a Corporation (Plaintiff); Paul Marciano (Plaintiff); Maurice Marciano (Plaintiff); Alex Yemenidjian (Plaintiff); Carlos Alberini (Plaintiff); Cynthia Livingston (Plaintiff); Anthony Chidoni (Plaintiff); Deborah Weinswig (Plaintiff); As to: NORTH AMERICAN SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant); TWIN CITY FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, a corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less