This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2023 at 08:09:46 (UTC).

BILL FLORES VS HOVHANNES HOVHANNISYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 BILL FLORES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HOVHANNES HOVHANNISYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK M. TAVELMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0938

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES BILL

Defendants

HARVARD JOHN

HOVHANNISYAN HOVHANNES

LYFT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SWANSON BENJAMIN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/28/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/28/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/28/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/28/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/28/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/28/2023: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/28/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/1/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 06/27/2023

6/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 06/27/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN SWANSON RE OSC

6/27/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF BENJAMIN SWANSON RE OSC

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

6/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2023
  • Hearing09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of Benjamin Swanson Re OSC; Filed by: BILL FLORES (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 06/27/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/27/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 09/27/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: BILL FLORES (Plaintiff); As to: LYFT, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/03/2023; Service Cost: 119.32; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: BILL FLORES (Plaintiff); As to: HOVHANNES HOVHANNISYAN (Defendant); JOHN HARVARD (Defendant); LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: BILL FLORES (Plaintiff); As to: HOVHANNES HOVHANNISYAN (Defendant); JOHN HARVARD (Defendant); LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: BILL FLORES (Plaintiff); As to: HOVHANNES HOVHANNISYAN (Defendant); JOHN HARVARD (Defendant); LYFT, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less