This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2023 at 02:09:28 (UTC).

QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/09/2023 QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CAROLYN B. KUHL and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3333

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CAROLYN B. KUHL

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

QBE INSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EVERAKES JORDAN B.

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/9/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/13/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case

6/13/2023: Notice of Related Case

Summons Summons on Complaint

6/13/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 06/29/2023

6/29/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;) of 06/29/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)

6/29/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Complex Determination;)

Notice (name extension) Notice of Entry of Order

7/11/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Entry of Order

Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

7/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Initial Status Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference; Initial Status Conference)

7/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference; Initial Status Conference)

Answer Defendant Southern California Edison Company’s Answer to Complaint

8/2/2023: Answer Defendant Southern California Edison Company’s Answer to Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

8/21/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Further Status Conference)

Minute Order Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

9/14/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/14/2023

DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023

DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/21/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketDefendant Southern California Edison Companys Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); As to: QBE Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12 updated: Result Date to 07/20/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference; Initial Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketNotice of Entry of Order; Filed by: QBE Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 07/20/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 12

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
06/29/2023

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 12 - Hon. Carolyn B. Kuhl; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: QBE Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: QBE Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: QBE Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2023

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: QBE Insurance Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less