This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2023 at 06:21:09 (UTC).

CLIFFORD THORNTON VS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, BUFFALO PUMPS DIVISION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2023 CLIFFORD THORNTON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, BUFFALO PUMPS DIVISION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5185

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION BUFFALO PUMPS DIVISION

AMCORD INC.

AMERICAN BILTRITE INC.

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL INC.

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

BIRD INCORPORATED

BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY

BW/IP INC.

CALPORTLAND COMPANY

CARRIER CORPORATION

CLEAVER-BROOKS INC.

CONWED CORPORATION

DOMCO PRODUCTS TEXAS INC.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION FKA THE DURIRON COMPANY INC.

FLOWSERVE US INC.

FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION

GARDNER DENVER INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GOODRICH CORPORATION

GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY

31 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

AGOPIAN SHAGHIG DAWN

ADABALE ESTHER LOLA

CUNNINGHAM EMILY

DEANE JEFFREY WILLIAM

DUFFY JOSEPH

FOLEY PATRICK J

GATT FREDERICK WILLIAM

JENKINS CHARLES W.

KARREN BRENT M.

BAILEY BOBBIE RAE

BERKES ROBERT H.

BAIN ELIZABETH R.

BERGSTROM EMILY DIANE

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

BUCK NANCY ERWIN

BUTY MADELINE L.

KATERNDAHL JOHN

Other Attorneys

FOLEY CRYSTAL G.

21 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

11/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer Defendant Pfizer Inc.’S Answer To Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint For Wrongful Death/Survival Action

11/21/2023: Answer Defendant Pfizer Inc.’S Answer To Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint For Wrongful Death/Survival Action

Answer Redco Corporation’s (Formerly Known as Crane Co.) Answer to Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint for Damages; Jury Demand

11/21/2023: Answer Redco Corporation’s (Formerly Known as Crane Co.) Answer to Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint for Damages; Jury Demand

Answer Defendant Simpson Timber Company’s Answer to First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action – Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial

11/21/2023: Answer Defendant Simpson Timber Company’s Answer to First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action – Asbestos; Demand for Jury Trial

Answer Answer of Defendant Flowserve Corporation F/K/A The Duriron Company, Inc. to Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action – Asbestos; Request for Jury Trial

11/21/2023: Answer Answer of Defendant Flowserve Corporation F/K/A The Duriron Company, Inc. to Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action – Asbestos; Request for Jury Trial

Answer Answer of Defendant Bird, Inc. to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint

11/20/2023: Answer Answer of Defendant Bird, Inc. to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint

Answer Defendant Parex USA, Inc.’s Answer To Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint For Wrongful Death/Survival Action

11/20/2023: Answer Defendant Parex USA, Inc.’s Answer To Plaintiffs’ First Amended Complaint For Wrongful Death/Survival Action

Motion to Quash Service of Summons Specially Appearing Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Service of Summons on First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

11/20/2023: Motion to Quash Service of Summons Specially Appearing Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation's Notice of Motion and Motion to Quash Service of Summons on First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Karen M. Stepanyan in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation's Motion to Quash Service of Summons on First Amended Complaint

11/20/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Karen M. Stepanyan in Support of Specially Appearing Defendant Superior Lidgerwood Mundy Corporation's Motion to Quash Service of Summons on First Amended Complaint

Answer Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc., fka Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., fka Atwood & Morrill's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death/Survival Action

11/17/2023: Answer Defendant Valves and Controls US, Inc., fka Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., fka Atwood & Morrill's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death/Survival Action

Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

11/17/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

Demand for Jury Trial Defendant The William Powell Company's Demand for Jury Trial

11/17/2023: Demand for Jury Trial Defendant The William Powell Company's Demand for Jury Trial

Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

11/17/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

Answer Defendant The William Powell Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival

11/17/2023: Answer Defendant The William Powell Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival

Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

11/17/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice of Remote Appearance

171 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/12/2024

Hearing06/12/2024 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2023

Hearing12/19/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Quash Service of Summons

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Thomas Thornton (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Thomas Thornton (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Thomas Thornton (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Thomas Thornton (Plaintiff); Result: Entered

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Payment of Waived Fees; by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
228 More Docket Entries
07/07/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: JCCP Coordinated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/07/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketPlaintiff's Application for an Order Admitting Andrew S. Murrie to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: Clifford Thornton (Plaintiff); As to: Clifford Thornton (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Laura A. Seigle in Department 15 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Clifford Thornton (Plaintiff); As to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); American Biltrite, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clifford Thornton (Plaintiff); As to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); American Biltrite, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Clifford Thornton (Plaintiff); As to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); American Biltrite, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketPreliminary Fact Sheet (Personal Injury Complaint); Filed by: Clifford Thornton (Plaintiff); As to: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Buffalo Pumps Division (Defendant); Amcord, Inc. (Defendant); American Biltrite, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/28/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Asbestos

[+] Read More [-] Read Less