This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2023 at 05:11:39 (UTC).

MOHAMMAD KHAN VS RITE AID CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2023 MOHAMMAD KHAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against RITE AID CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3106

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHAN MOHAMMAD

Defendants

PELFERRY LAURI

RITE AID CORPORATION

THRIFTY PAYLESS INC.

WILKINS KAMANI

RITE AID HEADQUARTERS CORP

RITE AID HEADQUARTERS CORPORATION

TRIGHT AID HEADQUARTERS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEGERIAN CARNEY R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

10/17/2023: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

10/2/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Order

10/2/2023: Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

9/15/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Summons Summons on Complaint (2nd)

9/5/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint (2nd)

Notice (name extension) Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/31/2023: Notice (name extension) Notice OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/31/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint SECOND (2nd)

8/31/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint SECOND (2nd)

Summons Summons on Complaint (1st)

8/30/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint (1st)

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint FIRST (1st)

8/28/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint FIRST (1st)

Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Without prejudice, Defendants Thrifty Payless, Inc., Lori Pelphrey, and Kamani Wilkins.

8/17/2023: Request for Dismissal Request for Dismissal Without prejudice, Defendants Thrifty Payless, Inc., Lori Pelphrey, and Kamani Wilkins.

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation re Dismissal of Thrifty Payless Inc Lori Pelphrey and Kamani Wilkins

8/14/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Joint Stipulation re Dismissal of Thrifty Payless Inc Lori Pelphrey and Kamani Wilkins

Order (name extension) Order PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. LORI PELPHREY AND KAMANI WILKINS

8/14/2023: Order (name extension) Order PROPOSED ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF THRIFTY PAYLESS INC. LORI PELPHREY AND KAMANI WILKINS

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/13/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Kymberleigh Damron-Hsiao Pursuant to CCP Section 430.41(a)(2) and 435.5(a)(2)

7/13/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Kymberleigh Damron-Hsiao Pursuant to CCP Section 430.41(a)(2) and 435.5(a)(2)

Proof of Service by Mail

6/27/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/01/2024

Hearing10/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/19/2024

Hearing09/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/15/2024

Hearing04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 04/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by: Rite Aid Corporation (Defendant); Bankruptcy Stay Case Type: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Bankruptcy

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketCase Management Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 09/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketJury Trial (15 Day Estimate) scheduled for 10/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
06/14/2023

DocketUpdated -- Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name): Filed By: Mohammad Khan (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/14/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Mohammad Khan (Plaintiff); As to: Rite Aid Corporation (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, Inc. (Defendant); Lauri Pelferry (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Mohammad Khan (Plaintiff); As to: Rite Aid Corporation (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, Inc. (Defendant); Lauri Pelferry (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mohammad Khan (Plaintiff); As to: Rite Aid Corporation (Defendant); Thrifty Payless, Inc. (Defendant); Lauri Pelferry (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less