This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2023 at 04:14:55 (UTC).

GO VENTURES LLC VS RAE WELLNESS PBC

Case Summary

On 05/31/2023 GO VENTURES LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RAE WELLNESS PBC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2351

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

GO VENTURES LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

RAE WELLNESS PBC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHMIDT DENIS

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SALTZ MICHAEL J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/31/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

5/31/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

5/31/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/1/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Summons on Complaint

6/1/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

6/29/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

7/24/2023: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/24/2023: Answer

Summons Summons on Cross Complaint

7/25/2023: Summons Summons on Cross Complaint

Request for Dismissal

9/12/2023: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/13/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/13/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by GO Ventures LLC on 05/31/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by GO Ventures LLC as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); Rae Wellness PBC (Cross-Complainant); As to: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant); GO Ventures LLC (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/25/2023

DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Rae Wellness PBC (Cross-Complainant); As to: GO Ventures LLC (Cross-Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant); As to: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant); As to: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant); Service Date: 06/14/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GO Ventures LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Rae Wellness PBC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less