This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2023 at 09:09:45 (UTC).

JOHN MORENO VS BOB & DAVE'S TOWING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 05/15/2023 JOHN MORENO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BOB DAVE'S TOWING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0872

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO JOHN

Defendant

BOB & DAVE'S TOWING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANUKYAN EDGAR

Defendant Attorney

KALRA GAURAV BOBBY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/15/2023: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/15/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/15/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/15/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/17/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

7/13/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2023
  • Hearing10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Bob & Dave's Towing, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: John Moreno (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 10/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Stephanie M. Bowick in Department 19 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: John Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Bob & Dave's Towing, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: John Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Bob & Dave's Towing, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: John Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: Bob & Dave's Towing, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less