This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2023 at 19:34:47 (UTC).

GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO VS SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2023 GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO filed an Other lawsuit against SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0382

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL CAMPO GABRIELA GONZALEZ

Defendants

PRIME HEALTHCARE A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WU JAMES M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELLY THOMAS H.

Defendant Attorney

TROTTER MICHAEL JOHN

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/14/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/14/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

3/14/2023: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/14/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/23/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

4/13/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

4/27/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Request for Dismissal

5/18/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer

5/23/2023: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 200 West Compton Blvd., Compton, CA 90220; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Prime Healthcare Services - St Francis, LLC dba St Francis Medical Center Erroneously Sued As SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant); As to: GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:3007878 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:3007879 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 129 with DismissalParty:3007880 resulted in empty message

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO on 03/14/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO, causes Prayer for Punitive Damages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO (Plaintiff); As to: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant); PRIME HEALTHCARE, a California corporation (Defendant); JAMES WU,, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Case Reassignment; Filed by: GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO (Plaintiff); As to: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant); PRIME HEALTHCARE, a California corporation (Defendant); JAMES WU,, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Case Reassignment: Name Extension changed from Notice of Case Reassignment to of Case Reassignment ; As To Parties changed from SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant), JAMES WU,, M.D. (Defendant), PRIME HEALTHCARE, a California corporation (Defendant) to PRIME HEALTHCARE, a California corporation (Defendant), JAMES WU,, M.D. (Defendant), SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Compton Courthouse in Department B - Hon. Fumiko Wassermaneffective 04/24/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO (Plaintiff); As to: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant); PRIME HEALTHCARE, a California corporation (Defendant); JAMES WU,, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO (Plaintiff); As to: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant); PRIME HEALTHCARE, a California corporation (Defendant); JAMES WU,, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: GABRIELA GONZALEZ DEL CAMPO (Plaintiff); As to: SAINT FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, a California corporation (Defendant); PRIME HEALTHCARE, a California corporation (Defendant); JAMES WU,, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. George F. Bird in Department B Compton Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less