This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 03:37:03 (UTC).

AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS GIDEON BENAKIVA, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2023 AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GIDEON BENAKIVA, AN INDIVIDUAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8126

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THIS COMPLAINT ADVERSE TO THE PLAINTIFFS TITLE OR ANY CLOUD ON PLAINTIFFS TITLE THERETO

BENAKIVA AN INDIVIDUAL GIDEON

CAMPANIANO AN INDIVIDUAL JEOLFA

SAPINOSO AN INDIVIDUAL ROSALINDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WRITER COURTNEY F.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

7/31/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/31/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

7/31/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

7/31/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/2/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application for Publication

11/3/2023: Application for Publication

Case Management Statement

11/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Order for Publication

11/9/2023: Order for Publication

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

 

Docket Entries

01/30/2024

Hearing01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/20/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/30/2024 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketOrder for Publication; Signed and Filed by: AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: GIDEON BENAKIVA, an individual (Defendant); JEOLFA CAMPANIANO, an individual (Defendant); ROSALINDA SAPINOSO, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2023

DocketUpdated -- Order for Publication: Filed By: AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 11/09/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by: AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: GIDEON BENAKIVA, an individual (Defendant); JEOLFA CAMPANIANO, an individual (Defendant); ROSALINDA SAPINOSO, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2023

DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketAddress for Courtney F. Writer (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: GIDEON BENAKIVA, an individual (Defendant); JEOLFA CAMPANIANO, an individual (Defendant); ROSALINDA SAPINOSO, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: GIDEON BENAKIVA, an individual (Defendant); JEOLFA CAMPANIANO, an individual (Defendant); ROSALINDA SAPINOSO, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: AMMIGEE MANAGEMENT, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff); As to: GIDEON BENAKIVA, an individual (Defendant); JEOLFA CAMPANIANO, an individual (Defendant); ROSALINDA SAPINOSO, an individual (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less