This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 02:16:41 (UTC).

CRISTIAN LEWIS-JOYNER VS PRIME COMMS RETAIL, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2023 CRISTIAN LEWIS-JOYNER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PRIME COMMS RETAIL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0401

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEWIS-JOYNER CRISTIAN

Defendant

PRIME COMMS RETAIL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAMPBELL JESSICA L.

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/24/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/24/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

8/24/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/24/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/24/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/24/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;) of 09/06/2023

9/6/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;) of 09/06/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;)

9/6/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Complex Determination;)

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 09/08/2023

9/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 09/08/2023

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

9/8/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

9/25/2023: Proof of Personal Service

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/22/2023

Hearing12/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/25/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cristian Lewis-Joyner (Plaintiff); As to: Prime Comms Retail, LLC (Defendant); Service Cost: 112.00; Service Date: 09/20/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketAddress for Jessica L. Campbell (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 28 - Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong; Reason: Other

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 09/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Non--Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
09/06/2023

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Michelle Williams Court; Reason: Deemed Non-Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2023

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cristian Lewis-Joyner (Plaintiff); As to: Prime Comms Retail, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Cristian Lewis-Joyner (Plaintiff); As to: Prime Comms Retail, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cristian Lewis-Joyner (Plaintiff); As to: Prime Comms Retail, LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less