This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/03/2023 at 08:37:07 (UTC).

ERICA CHAVEZ VS GAMESTOP, INC.,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 ERICA CHAVEZ filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GAMESTOP, INC ,,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2392

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAVEZ ERICA

Defendants

GAMESTOP CORP.

GAMESTOP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARQUEZ JUSTIN F

Defendant Attorney

ASTERLIN ALEXANDRA M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/15/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/15/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/15/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/15/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Initial Status Conference Order

9/26/2023: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case) of 09/26/2023, Initial Status Conference Order

9/26/2023: Certificate of Mailing for Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case) of 09/26/2023, Initial Status Conference Order

Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case)

9/26/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Court Order Re: Newly Filed Case)

Proof of Personal Service

10/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/27/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

11/21/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer Answer Defendants Gamestop, Inc. And Gamestop Corp.’S Answer To Complaint

11/22/2023: Answer Answer Defendants Gamestop, Inc. And Gamestop Corp.’S Answer To Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/02/2024

Hearing01/02/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 11 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketAnswer Defendants Gamestop, Inc. And Gamestop Corp.?S Answer To Complaint; Filed by: GameStop, Inc., (Defendant); GameStop Corp. (Defendant); As to: Erica Chavez (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2023

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Initial Status Conference scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/02/2024 09:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erica Chavez (Plaintiff); As to: GameStop, Inc., (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Erica Chavez (Plaintiff); As to: GameStop Corp. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/27/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference scheduled for 12/06/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 11

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Deemed Complex

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
09/18/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. David S. Cunningham III in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Erica Chavez (Plaintiff); As to: GameStop, Inc., (Defendant); GameStop Corp. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Erica Chavez (Plaintiff); As to: GameStop, Inc., (Defendant); GameStop Corp. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Erica Chavez (Plaintiff); As to: GameStop, Inc., (Defendant); GameStop Corp. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less