This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/03/2023 at 00:52:38 (UTC).

IRMA DUARTE VS SMART AND FINAL STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2023 IRMA DUARTE filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against SMART AND FINAL STORES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4091

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUARTE IRMA

Defendants

SMART AND FINAL STORES INC.

SMART & FINAL STORES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALADZHYAN NICK

Defendant Attorney

CHERMELA JASON R.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

6/20/2023: Unknown - EIGHTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/20/2023: Complaint

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

6/20/2023: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/20/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/20/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/20/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/11/2023: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

7/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/31/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/3/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/14/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/14/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

8/14/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/17/2025

Hearing06/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2024

Hearing12/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2024

Hearing12/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Smart & Final Stores , LLC (Defendant); As to: Irma Duarte (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Smart & Final Stores , LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Smart & Final Stores , LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Irma Duarte (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/31/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Irma Duarte (Plaintiff); As to: Smart and Final Stores, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/27/2023; Service Cost: 81.42; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Irma Duarte (Plaintiff); As to: Smart & Final Stores , LLC (Defendant); Service Date: 07/13/2023; Service Cost: 81.65; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Irma Duarte (Plaintiff); As to: Smart and Final Stores, Inc. (Defendant); Smart & Final Stores , LLC (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
06/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/17/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kerry Bensinger in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Irma Duarte (Plaintiff); As to: Smart and Final Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Irma Duarte (Plaintiff); As to: Smart and Final Stores, Inc. (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/03/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

[+] Read More [-] Read Less