This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2023 at 11:43:32 (UTC).

MARTHA MORALES VS COASTAL HEALTH CARE, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS ?BRENTWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER?

Case Summary

On 09/15/2023 MARTHA MORALES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against COASTAL HEALTH CARE, INC , A NEVADA CORPORATION, DOING BUSINESS AS BRENTWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4407

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES MARTHA

Defendant

COASTAL HEALTH CARE INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION DOING BUSINESS AS ?BRENTWOOD HEALTH CARE CENTER?

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN KAUR

Defendant Attorney

PETERSEN CLARISSE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/15/2023: Complaint

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

9/15/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/15/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/15/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

9/15/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/15/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

9/15/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/20/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/25/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/15/2023: Answer

 

Docket Entries

01/18/2024

Hearing01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department P at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: COASTAL HEALTH CARE, INC., a Nevada Corporation, doing business as ?Brentwood Health Care Center? (Defendant); As to: MARTHA MORALES (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: MARTHA MORALES (Plaintiff); As to: COASTAL HEALTH CARE, INC., a Nevada Corporation, doing business as ?Brentwood Health Care Center? (Defendant); Service Cost: 90.50; Proof of Mailing Date: 10/20/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine W. Mandel in Department P Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2024 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department P

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARTHA MORALES (Plaintiff); As to: COASTAL HEALTH CARE, INC., a Nevada Corporation, doing business as Brentwood Health Care Center (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARTHA MORALES (Plaintiff); As to: COASTAL HEALTH CARE, INC., a Nevada Corporation, doing business as Brentwood Health Care Center (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARTHA MORALES (Plaintiff); As to: COASTAL HEALTH CARE, INC., a Nevada Corporation, doing business as Brentwood Health Care Center (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less