*******2919
09/14/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Property - Other Personal Property
Los Angeles, California
GONZALEZ PEDRO
MIRAMONTES ARCE MARILU
AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO. INC.
JACOBSON KEVIN
MIJANGOS CINDY L
9/14/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint
9/14/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet
9/14/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing
9/14/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
9/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet
9/14/2023: Complaint
9/14/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet
9/15/2023: Proof of Personal Service
9/15/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference
10/12/2023: Answer
Hearing01/19/2024 at 1:30 PM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference
[-] Read LessDocketAnswer; Filed by: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); As to: Pedro Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Marilu Miramontes Arce (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Pedro Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Marilu Miramontes Arce (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Date: 09/15/2023
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/19/2024 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Pedro Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Marilu Miramontes Arce (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Pedro Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Marilu Miramontes Arce (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Pedro Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Marilu Miramontes Arce (Plaintiff); As to: American Honda Motor Co., Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketThe case is placed in special status of: Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act (Lemon Law)
[-] Read Less