This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2023 at 05:34:30 (UTC).

MATTHEW DESHAWN ELLIOTT VS OSCAR ISIDRO MORALES LIMON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/07/2023 MATTHEW DESHAWN ELLIOTT filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OSCAR ISIDRO MORALES LIMON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8647

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ELLIOTT MATTHEW DESHAWN

NATIER CLASINA

Defendants

MORALES LIMON OSCAR ISIDRO

MORALES SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMPION KIA S.

Defendant Attorney

AHO ALLEN S.

 

Court Documents

Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

8/7/2023: Unknown Eighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

8/7/2023: Summons Summons on Complaint

Complaint

8/7/2023: Complaint

Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

8/7/2023: Unknown Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

8/7/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

8/7/2023: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

8/7/2023: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

9/19/2023: Amended Complaint Amended Complaint (1st)

Request for Dismissal

10/2/2023: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

10/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/20/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demand for Jury Trial

11/15/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/15/2023: Answer

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/04/2025

Hearing08/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2025

Hearing02/03/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/21/2025

Hearing01/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

DocketAddress for Allen S. Aho (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketAnswer; Filed by: Oscar Isidro Morales Limon (Defendant); Sandra Morales (Defendant); As to: Matthew Deshawn Elliott (Plaintiff); Clasina Natier (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2023

DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Oscar Isidro Morales Limon (Defendant); Sandra Morales (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Matthew Deshawn Elliott (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Isidro Morales Limon (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/17/2023; Service Cost: Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Matthew Deshawn Elliott (Plaintiff); As to: Sandra Morales (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/17/2023; Service Cost: 66.56; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2023

DocketUpdated -- Proof of Personal Service: Document changed from Proof of Service by Substituted Service to Proof of Personal Service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/03/2023

DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Matthew Deshawn Elliott (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 10/03/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Oscar Isidro Morales Limon (Defendant) to Clasina Natier (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
08/07/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lynne M. Hobbs in Department 30 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Matthew Deshawn Elliott (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Isidro Morales Limon (Defendant); Sandra Morales (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Matthew Deshawn Elliott (Plaintiff); As to: Oscar Isidro Morales Limon (Defendant); Sandra Morales (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketEighth Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/21/2025 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less