This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2023 at 05:45:43 (UTC).

RAMIRO HERRERA, JOSE VS ESTRADA, MARIA ENRIQUETA

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 RAMIRO HERRERA, JOSE filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against ESTRADA, MARIA ENRIQUETA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAUFMAN, SHELLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0005

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KAUFMAN, SHELLEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RAMIRO HERRERA JOSE

Respondent

ESTRADA MARIA ENRIQUETA

Not Classified By Court

GASCON GEORGE - District Attorney

 

Court Documents

Warrant - Issued - In Lieu of Habeas Corpus (file copy)

5/11/2023: Warrant - Issued - In Lieu of Habeas Corpus (file copy)

Notice - Of Application For The Return Of The Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

5/11/2023: Notice - Of Application For The Return Of The Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - Regarding For Return Of Minor Child To Petitioner Under The Hague Convention And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon

5/11/2023: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law - Regarding For Return Of Minor Child To Petitioner Under The Hague Convention And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Regarding Memorandum Of Law: The Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hague

5/11/2023: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Regarding Memorandum Of Law: The Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hague

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Regarding In Support Of Expedited Proceedings Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

5/11/2023: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - Regarding In Support Of Expedited Proceedings Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction

Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law

5/11/2023: Petition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law

Warrant - Issued - Protective Custody Warrant (File copy)

5/19/2023: Warrant - Issued - Protective Custody Warrant (File copy)

Declaration - of Senior Investigator Dennis Miller in Support of Request for Protective Custody Warrant

5/19/2023: Declaration - of Senior Investigator Dennis Miller in Support of Request for Protective Custody Warrant

Minute Order

5/25/2023: Minute Order

Proof of Service

5/25/2023: Proof of Service

Order - Notice of Ruling from May 25, 2023 Hearing

6/1/2023: Order - Notice of Ruling from May 25, 2023 Hearing

Minute Order

6/27/2023: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

06/27/2023

Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Case Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketOrder (Notice of Ruling from May 25, 2023 Hearing ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kaufman, Shelley, Presiding; Habeas Corpus Hearing - Held - Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketMinute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/25/2023

DocketProof of Service; Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketDeclaration (of Senior Investigator Dennis Miller in Support of Request for Protective Custody Warrant ); Filed by District Attorney - Central Authority

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2023

DocketWarrant - Issued (Protective Custody Warrant (File copy) )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law (Regarding For Return Of Minor Child To Petitioner Under The Hague Convention And Declaration Of Rosa Alarcon ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketPetition - Habeas Corpus - Family Law; Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketWarrant - Issued (In Lieu of Habeas Corpus (file copy) )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketNotice (Of Application For The Return Of The Minor Child Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Regarding In Support Of Expedited Proceedings Under The Hague Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2023

DocketMemorandum - Points and Authorities (Regarding Memorandum Of Law: The Convention On The Civil Aspects Of International Child Abduction, Done At The Hague ); Filed by Petitioner

[+] Read More [-] Read Less