This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/31/2023 at 00:10:38 (UTC).

MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV VS ALICE RAMOS

Case Summary

On 05/05/2023 MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALICE RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is OLIVIA ROSALES. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1365

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

OLIVIA ROSALES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHRAMOV MARLENA LOREN

Defendant

RAMOS ALICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMPION KIARASH SHAMLOO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/5/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/5/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/5/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/5/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/9/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Settlement

8/2/2023: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED AUGU...) OF 08/04/2023

8/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED AUGU...) OF 08/04/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED AUGU...)

8/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER ON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED AUGU...)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

8/16/2023: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV on 05/05/2023, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal With Prejudice as to the Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action; Filed by: MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV (Plaintiff); As to: ALICE RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order on Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Filed Augu...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order on Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Filed Augu...) of 08/04/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/31/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Olivia Rosales in Department F Norwalk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/31/2023 at 01:30 PM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department F

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV (Plaintiff); As to: ALICE RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV (Plaintiff); As to: ALICE RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: MARLENA LOREN KHRAMOV (Plaintiff); As to: ALICE RAMOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less