This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/13/2023 at 15:37:20 (UTC).

ANGELA SONG, AN INDIVIDUAL VS WEINGARTEN NOSTAT, INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/08/2023 ANGELA SONG, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WEINGARTEN NOSTAT, INC , A TEXAS CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1794

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SONG AN INDIVIDUAL ANGELA

Defendants

HOHMAN AN INDIVIDUAL KINDY

KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION A MARYLAND CORPORATION

WEINGARTEN NOSTAT INC. A TEXAS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JEONG CHAN YONG

 

Court Documents

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/8/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/8/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/8/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/8/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/8/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

9/8/2023: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/11/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/12/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

12/07/2023

Hearing12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 78

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANGELA SONG, an individual (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANGELA SONG, an individual (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jill Feeney in Department 78 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANGELA SONG, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: WEINGARTEN NOSTAT, INC., a Texas corporation (Defendant); KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION, a Maryland corporation (Defendant); KINDY HOHMAN, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANGELA SONG, an individual (Plaintiff); As to: WEINGARTEN NOSTAT, INC., a Texas corporation (Defendant); KIMCO REALTY CORPORATION, a Maryland corporation (Defendant); KINDY HOHMAN, an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less