This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2021 at 00:54:56 (UTC).

CASE BARNETT LAW CORPORATION, ET AL. VS CHRISTOPHER BROWN; CRNA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2019 CASE BARNETT LAW CORPORATION, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER BROWN CRNA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is YOLANDA OROZCO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4534

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

YOLANDA OROZCO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASE BARNETT LAW CORPORATION

STEVENS LESLEY

Defendants

OPEN ADVANTAGE MRI A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ARLINGTON AVE MEDICAL GROUP

CHRISTOPHER BROWN; CRNA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZIMMERMAN CHIROPRACTIC AND ACCUPUNCTURE

ORANGE COUNTY PAIN SPECIALISTS; A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NEWPORT INSTITUE OF MINIMALLY INVASIVE SURGERY

DME PROFESSIONAL MEDICAL INC.

NEWPORT CARE MEDICAL GROUP A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THE RAWLINGS COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STARPOINT SURGERY CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARNETT CASE C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2021

3/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/05/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/17/2021

2/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 02/17/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

7/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020

3/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/01/2020

Case Management Order

5/15/2019: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Request for Dismissal

5/2/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2019: Proof of Personal Service

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docketat 10:37 AM in Department 31, Yolanda Orozco, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff); Lesley Stevens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff); Lesley Stevens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff); Lesley Stevens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff); Lesley Stevens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff); Lesley Stevens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff); Lesley Stevens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Case Barnett Law Corporation (Plaintiff); Lesley Stevens (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less