This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 16:48:42 (UTC).

CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC VS ERIC GERARDO LEYVA-BUCCIO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against ERIC GERARDO LEYVA-BUCCIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, DAVID J. COWAN and MARY H. STROBEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4124

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

DAVID J. COWAN

MARY H. STROBEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES LLC

BATT WALTER

CROSSAN ROBERT

DE LA HOYA OSCAR

DV CAPITAL PARTNERS LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GOOCH MICHAEL A.

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

LEYVA-BUCCIO ERIC GERARDO

RUCCIONE GINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

SEARCY MARSHALL M.

HALM DAVID G.

ANDRADE SEAN ADRIAN

TORRES-GUILLEN SYLVIA ADRIAN

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

HALM DAVID G.

ANDRADE SEAN ADRIAN

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING CROSS-DEFENDANTS CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC, MICHAEL A. GOOCH, ROBERT CROSSAN, AND DV CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLCS

5/11/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING CROSS-DEFENDANTS CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC, MICHAEL A. GOOCH, ROBERT CROSSAN, AND DV CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLCS

Case Management Statement

4/4/2022: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID G. HALM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ERIC GERARDO LEYVA-BUCCIOS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

2/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID G. HALM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ERIC GERARDO LEYVA-BUCCIOS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/19/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/19/2022: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/14/2022: Cross-Complaint

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/28/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Answer

4/14/2022: Answer

Complaint

12/17/2021: Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER H. FOUNTAIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 435.5

6/24/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER H. FOUNTAIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 435.5

Case Management Statement

6/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/25/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/10/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PETER H. FOUNTAIN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING CROSSDEFENDANTS CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC, MICHAEL A. GOOCH, ROBERT CROSSAN, AND

5/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF PETER H. FOUNTAIN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING CROSSDEFENDANTS CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC, MICHAEL A. GOOCH, ROBERT CROSSAN, AND

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CROSS-DEFENDANTS CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC, MICHAEL A. GOOCH, ROBERT CROSSAN, AND DV CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLCS T

5/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CROSS-DEFENDANTS CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC, MICHAEL A. GOOCH, ROBERT CROSSAN, AND DV CAPITAL PARTNERS, LLCS T

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • Hearing03/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Hearing06/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (OF PETER H. FOUNTAIN PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41 435.5); Filed by Michael A. Gooch (Cross-Defendant); Robert Crossan (Cross-Defendant); DV Capital Partners, LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company (Cross-Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 48; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by ERIC GERARDO LEYVA-BUCCIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Oscar de la Hoya (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by GINA RUCCIONE (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by GINA RUCCIONE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by GINA RUCCIONE (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docketat 1:07 PM in Department 1, Mary H. Strobel, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 12/27/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 82, Mary H. Strobel, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER) of 12/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CASA MEXICO ENTERPRISES, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******4124 Hearing Date: February 23, 2022 Dept: 48

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE

Peter Fountain and Christopher Kercher seek to be admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Casa Mexico Enterprises, LLC in this action.

An attorney in good standing in another jurisdiction who is not be a resident of California, regularly employed in California, or regularly engaged in substantial business, professional, or other activities in California may apply to appear as counsel pro hac vice in California. (California Rules of Court, rule 9.40(a).) The attorney must a verified application together with proof of service by mail of a copy of the application and notice of hearing on all parties who have appeared in the case and on the State Bar of California at its San Francisco office. (California Rules of Court, rule 9.40(c).) The applicant must also pay a $50.00 fee to the State Bar of California. (California Rules of Court, rule 9.40(e).)

The application must state (1) the applicant’s residence and office addresses; (2) the courts to which the applicant has been admitted to practice and the dates of admission; (3) that the applicant is a member in good standing in those courts; (4) that the applicant is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court; (5) the title of each court and cause in which the applicant has filed an application to appear as counsel pro hac vice in this state in the preceding two years, the date of each application, and whether or not it was granted; and (6) the name, address, and telephone number of the active member of the State Bar of California who is attorney of record in the local action. (California Rules of Court, rule 9.40(d).)

Peter Fountain’s and Christopher Kercher’s applications comply with the requirements. Accordingly, the applications for admission pro hac vice are GRANTED.

A Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Annual Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees by Peter Fountain is scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 48 at Stanley Mosk Courthouse.

A Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Annual Pro Hac Vice Renewal Fees by Christopher Kercher is scheduled for 03/09/2023 at 8:30 AM in Department 48 at Stanley Mosk Courthouse.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SMCDEPT48@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit. Parties intending to appear are STRONGLY encouraged to appear remotely.


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALM DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDRADE SEAN ADRIAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SEARCY MARSHALL