This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2022 at 09:38:30 (UTC).

CARTER SPARKS VS SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 CARTER SPARKS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPARKS CARTER

Defendants

SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

FILA SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

HOWARD JOHN

STUMREITER JOHN J.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/12/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/11/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/24/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Initial Status Conference Report

6/24/2022: Initial Status Conference Report

Case Management Statement

6/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE 1.NOTICE OF ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE 1.NOTICE OF ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE RE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/1/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 06/17/2022

6/17/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DEMURRER WITH MOTION TO STRIKE) OF 06/17/2022

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN J. STUMREITER AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF (1) DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

6/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN J. STUMREITER AND EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF (1) DEMURRERS TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

6/1/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Exhibit List

6/1/2022: Exhibit List

Request for Judicial Notice

6/1/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

6/1/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Amended Complaint

4/27/2022: Amended Complaint

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN J. STUMREITER RE INABILITY TO MEET AND CONFER (CODE CIV. PROC. 430.41, 435.5)

3/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOHN J. STUMREITER RE INABILITY TO MEET AND CONFER (CODE CIV. PROC. 430.41, 435.5)

Proof of Personal Service

2/15/2022: Proof of Personal Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • Hearing04/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Defendant); Susan Fila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Report; Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Defendant); Susan Fila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketNotice (1.Notice of Order Setting Hearing on Demurrer and Motion to Strike Re First Amended Complaint); Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docketat 3:15 PM in Department N, Craig D. Karlan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Santa Monica Community College District (Defendant); Susan Fila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDECLARATION OF JOHN J. STUMREITER RE INABILITY TO MEET AND CONFER (Code Civ. Proc. 430.41, 435.5); Filed by Susan Fila (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carter Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTA MONICA COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOWARD JOHN