This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2022 at 03:04:54 (UTC).

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CALIFORNIA FAIR PLAN ASSOCIATION, A PRIVATE ASSOCIATION OF INSURERS

Case Summary

On 04/11/2022 CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CALIFORNIA FAIR PLAN ASSOCIATION, A PRIVATE ASSOCIATION OF INSURERS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2218

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRINGTON MORTGAGE SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

CALIFORNIA FAIR PLAN ASSOCIATION A PRIVATE ASSOCIATION OF INSURERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELAMORA ANNABELLE

Defendant Attorney

KLEIN ELISE D.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/11/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/11/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/11/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/11/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/11/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/11/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

6/14/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • Hearing07/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by California Fair Plan Association, a private association of insurers (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA FAIR PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases where Carrington Mortgage Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DE LA MORA ANNABELLE