This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2021 at 08:27:08 (UTC).

CARRILLO, CLAUDIA Y. VS CRUZ, ELIAS D.

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 CARRILLO, CLAUDIA Y filed a Family - Marriage Annulment lawsuit against CRUZ, ELIAS D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOSLEY, GIA G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0043

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Annulment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOSLEY, GIA G

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARRILLO CLAUDIA Y.

Respondent

CRUZ ELIAS D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LEVY ERIC MARSHALL

 

Court Documents

Responsive Declaration

2/16/2021: Responsive Declaration

Declaration - UCCJEA

2/16/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

2/16/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - of ELECTRONIC SERVICE

2/16/2021: Proof of Service - of ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - *Granted in whole*

2/19/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 - *Granted in whole*

Minute Order

2/17/2021: Minute Order

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

2/17/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

2/17/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/15/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/15/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Nullity w/ Minor Child

1/15/2021: Petition - Nullity w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/15/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Ex Parte - Application - Child Custody and Visitation

1/15/2021: Ex Parte - Application - Child Custody and Visitation

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/15/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Ex Parte - Order

1/15/2021: Ex Parte - Order

Summons

1/15/2021: Summons

Notice - Case Assignment

1/15/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Minute Order

1/15/2021: Minute Order

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • Hearing03/24/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department 11 at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Ex Parte Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003 (*Granted in whole* ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (of ELECTRONIC SERVICE ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001 (Waiver forwarded to Dept 11 for approval ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 11, Bosley, Gia G, Presiding; Ex Parte Hearing - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (Child Custody and Visitation ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEx Parte - Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY ERIC MARSHALL