This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 10:24:12 (UTC).

CARRIE ROSE VS LAWNDALE ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 10/25/2018 CARRIE ROSE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LAWNDALE ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2288

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSE CARRIE

Defendant

LAWNDALE ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOLENDER JEFFREY SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/25/2018: Complaint

Unknown

10/25/2018: Unknown

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/25/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

10/25/2018: Summons

Proof of Personal Service

11/6/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

4/8/2019: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Carrie Rose (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Carrie Rose (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Carrie Rose (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carrie Rose (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carrie Rose (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWNDALE ELEMENTARY SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOLENDER JEFFREY