This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2023 at 08:05:39 (UTC).

CARRIE MILLER, ET AL. VS THE HUSL LTD., A SAINT LUCIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2022 CARRIE MILLER, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against THE HUSL LTD , A SAINT LUCIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1036

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEROUX WAKE

MILLER CARRIE

Defendants

BAJAJ VARUN

SCHELLHAS MATTHEW

THE HUSL LTD. A SAINT LUCIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLIN GARY R.

Defendant Attorney

CARYL JESSE M.

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/5/2023: Answer

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/9/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/6/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/6/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/27/2023, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

2/27/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/27/2023, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Answer

2/14/2023: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/30/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/23/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/12/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

1/3/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/30/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/30/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/30/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • Hearing12/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2023
  • Hearing11/16/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Matthew Schellhas (Defendant); As to: Carrie Miller (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Carrie Miller (Plaintiff); Wake LeRoux (Plaintiff); As to: Matthew Schellhas (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Carrie Miller (Plaintiff); Wake LeRoux (Plaintiff); As to: The Husl Ltd., a Saint Lucia corporation (Defendant); Matthew Schellhas (Defendant); Varun Bajaj (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Matthew Schellhas; On the Complaint filed by Carrie Miller, et al. on 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAddress for Gary R. Carlin (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/23/2023 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Carrie Miller (Plaintiff); Wake LeRoux (Plaintiff); As to: The Husl Ltd., a Saint Lucia corporation (Defendant); Matthew Schellhas (Defendant); Varun Bajaj (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Carrie Miller (Plaintiff); Wake LeRoux (Plaintiff); As to: The Husl Ltd., a Saint Lucia corporation (Defendant); Matthew Schellhas (Defendant); Varun Bajaj (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Carrie Miller (Plaintiff); Wake LeRoux (Plaintiff); As to: The Husl Ltd., a Saint Lucia corporation (Defendant); Matthew Schellhas (Defendant); Varun Bajaj (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less