Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 06:04:32 (UTC).

CARRIE GARCIA VS SDP INVESTMENTS INC

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 CARRIE GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SDP INVESTMENTS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7632

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GARCIA CARRIE

Defendants and Respondents

S.D.P. INVESTENTS INC

DOES 1 TO 20

HOLLYWOOD INN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GEVORKIAN GAYANE ESQ.

ZORABIAN AVO

Defendant Attorneys

WOOD SMITH HENNING & BERMAN LLP

BRINSON KATHERINE J.

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION AND TANGIBLE THINGS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ETC

7/30/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION AND TANGIBLE THINGS AND REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS, ETC

ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;DEMAND FPR JURY TRIAL

2/16/2018: ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;DEMAND FPR JURY TRIAL

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/16/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/25/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Ruling

8/8/2018: Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel

5/30/2019: Motion to Compel

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

3/23/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION

Unknown

1/25/2019: Unknown

Order

1/31/2019: Order

HOLLYWOOD INN, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/26/2018: HOLLYWOOD INN, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

1/24/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

Motion to Compel

5/15/2019: Motion to Compel

Minute Order

1/31/2019: Minute Order

COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

12/20/2017: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION AND TANGIBLE THINGS; DECLARATION OF MELODY SAADIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

7/26/2018: DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION AND TANGIBLE THINGS; DECLARATION OF MELODY SAADIAN IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

3/26/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

STIPULATION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; ORDER

2/22/2018: STIPULATION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT; ORDER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/10/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Motion to Compel (Plaintiff Carrie Garcia's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel the Deposition of Person Most Qualified and Request for Sanctions; Memorandum of the Points and Authorities in Support thereof: Declaration of Avo Zorabian, Esq.; and Exhibits); Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Plaintiff Carrie Garcia's Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel the Deposition of Nick Dahya and Request for Sanctions; Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Regarding Entry of Order to Predate Plaintiff's Notice of Deposit- Jury Fees) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Order (Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Regarding Entry of Order to Predate Plaintiff's Notice of Deposit - Jury Fees); Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Regarding Entry of Order to P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2018
  • STIPULATION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM PLAINTIFF S COMPLAINT; ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO STRIKE PRAYER FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FROM PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Stipulation and Order; Filed by S.D.P. Investents, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT;DEMAND FPR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Answer; Filed by S.D.P. Investents, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Carrie Garcia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less