This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2020 at 05:35:49 (UTC).

CARREON, JENNIFER VS RODRIGUEZ, CHEYENNE CASSANDRA

Case Summary

On 04/03/2020 CARREON, JENNIFER filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, CHEYENNE CASSANDRA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SKEBA, VALERIE L. and NORD, SCOTT J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0330

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SKEBA, VALERIE L.

NORD, SCOTT J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARREON JENNIFER

Respondent

RODRIGUEZ CHEYENNE CASSANDRA

 

Court Documents

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

4/24/2020: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

Minute Order

5/15/2020: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

4/3/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

4/3/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/3/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

4/3/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Civil Harassment

4/3/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

Minute Order

4/24/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

4/24/2020: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Nord, Scott J., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department A10, Skeba, Valerie L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.