Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 10:39:51 (UTC).

CARR, TORINO VS CARR, ANDREA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 CARR, TORINO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CARR, ANDREA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRETT, CARLA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0053

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GARRETT, CARLA L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CARR TORINO

Respondent

CARR ANDREA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THORSTEINSON BRETT TYLER

Respondent Attorney

CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Of Attorney In Support Of Respondent's RFO For Attorneys Fees and Costs

4/16/2021: Declaration - Of Attorney In Support Of Respondent's RFO For Attorneys Fees and Costs

Memorandum - Points and Authorities - In Support of RFO

4/16/2021: Memorandum - Points and Authorities - In Support of RFO

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/16/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

RFO/MTN - Attorney Fees - Spousal Support

4/16/2021: RFO/MTN - Attorney Fees - Spousal Support

Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

4/20/2021: Order - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

Minute Order

4/29/2021: Minute Order

Dissomaster Printout

4/29/2021: Dissomaster Printout

Response - Application for Expedited Child Support

4/9/2021: Response - Application for Expedited Child Support

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/9/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

3/30/2021: Notice - Acknowledgement of Receipt

Application - for Expedited Child Support Order

3/30/2021: Application - for Expedited Child Support Order

Proof of Service of Summons

3/1/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

3/10/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Declaration - UCCJEA

3/10/2021: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/20/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/20/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Notice - Case Assignment

1/20/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/20/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Hearing08/13/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department S14 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Request for Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Hearing08/13/2021 at 1:30 PM in Department S14 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department S14, Garrett, Carla L., Presiding; Motion Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDissomaster Printout

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketOrder - Family-Centered Case Resolution Conference (FAM 112)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATENA ANTHONY JOSEPH