This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 03:09:07 (UTC).

CARON WEIDNER VS ALLISON BOND ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/16/2017 CARON WEIDNER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ALLISON BOND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4225

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WEIDNER CARON

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1-10

TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

BOND ALLISON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF RICHARD A. LENSE

Defendant Attorneys

GARRETT BENSON E.

TYSON & MENDES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

8/28/2018: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

3/21/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

9/4/2018: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

DEFENDANT, ALLISON BOND'S ANSWER: TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/19/2017: DEFENDANT, ALLISON BOND'S ANSWER: TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

10/24/2017: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Request for Dismissal

9/28/2018: Request for Dismissal

RETURN OF PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

5/10/2017: RETURN OF PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE FROM ANY RETAINED EXPERTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CATIE R. JOHNSON; [PROPOSEDI ORDER

8/8/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.2 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM INTRODUCING EVIDENCE FROM ANY RETAINED EXPERTS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CATIE R. JOHNSON; [PROPOSEDI ORDER

RETURN OF PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT ALLISON BOND

12/4/2017: RETURN OF PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT ALLISON BOND

CIVIL DEPOSIT

8/6/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S NON- RETAINED TREATMENT PHYSICIANS TO THOSE ACQUIRED FOR PURPOSES OF THEFL TREATMENT OF CARON WEIDNER; MEMORANDUM OF

8/8/2018: DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. I TO EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFF'S NON- RETAINED TREATMENT PHYSICIANS TO THOSE ACQUIRED FOR PURPOSES OF THEFL TREATMENT OF CARON WEIDNER; MEMORANDUM OF

DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/6/2018: DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEFENDANT, TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPIAINT

4/27/2017: DEFENDANT, TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPIAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5; (Trial; Case Deemed Settled) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-09-17 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5; Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; No Appearance) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-08-21 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Caron Weidner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts; Filed by Allison Bond (Defendant); Trader Joe's Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • RETURN OF PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANT TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • Miscellaneous-Other; Filed by Caron Weidner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DEFENDANT, TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, INC.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPIAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Trader Joe's Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Caron Weidner (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • COMPLA[NT FOR DAMAGES: NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less