This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2020 at 03:25:17 (UTC).

CAROLYN SPIEGEL VS SKY LINE DEVELOPING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/05/2019 CAROLYN SPIEGEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SKY LINE DEVELOPING CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3424

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SPIEGEL CAROLYN AN INDIVIDUAL

WEPRIN ELIZABETH

TISHERMAN PEACOCK EDANA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NAHUM SHLOMO AKA SHLOMI NAHUM

SKY LINE DEVELOPING & CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COHEN TZAFRIR AKA ZAFF COHEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

JIMENEZ JAMES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

WEIMAN EDWARD ELLIS

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

1/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ARBITRATION

1/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE ARBITRATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

1/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE (ALL-PURPOSE))

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (ARBITRATION)

1/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (ARBITRATION)

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

1/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; STATUS CONFERENCE (A...)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; STATUS CONFERENCE (A...)

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

10/31/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/24/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/9/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

10/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Case Management Statement

9/24/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

10/1/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

9/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal ((Arbitration)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION); Filed by Sky Line Developing & Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Shlomo Nahum (Defendant); Tzafrir Cohen (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause re Dismissal (Arbitration)); Filed by Carolyn Spiegel, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference ((All-Purpose)) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 58; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference (All-Purpose))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (re Arbitration); Filed by Carolyn Spiegel, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION); Filed by Sky Line Developing & Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Shlomo Nahum (Defendant); Tzafrir Cohen (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sky Line Developing & Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Shlomo Nahum (Defendant); Tzafrir Cohen (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Sky Line Developing & Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Sky Line Developing & Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sky Line Developing & Construction, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Shlomo Nahum (Defendant); Tzafrir Cohen (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carolyn Spiegel, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Carolyn Spiegel, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carolyn Spiegel, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEIMAN EDWARD E.