This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/29/2019 at 02:01:24 (UTC).

CAROLYN ROBERTSON VS STARBUCKS CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by CAROLYN ROBERTSON against STARBUCKS CORPORATION in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0024

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

ROBERTSON CAROLYN

Defendants and Respondents

STARBUCKS CORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 100

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

12/18/2018: Stipulation and Order

Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

5/9/2019: Stipulation to Continue Trial/FSC [and Related Motion/Discovery Dates] Personal Injury Courts Only (Department 91, 92, 93, 97)

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

2/22/2018: STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

Proof of Service

2/22/2018: Proof of Service

CIVIL DEPOSIT

2/22/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

2/22/2018: STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Proof of Service

2/22/2018: Proof of Service

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

1/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

1/16/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

1/16/2018: PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

SUMMONS

1/16/2018: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Stipulation and Protective Order - Confidential Designation; Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • STARBUCKS CORPORATION'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Starbucks Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Carolyn Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Carolyn Robertson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC690024    Hearing Date: January 03, 2020    Dept: 2

Robertson v. Starbucks Corporation

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Carol Robertson is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. Counsel has not provided proof that both Plaintiff and the Defendant were served with the motion and proposed order and when service was accomplished. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1013a.

Counsel is ordered to comply with Cal Rules of Court 3.1362.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC690024    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 2

Robertson v. Starbucks Corporation

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Carol Robertson is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.

Plaintiff’s counsel filed a proof of service showing that Notice of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record was served by mail on 10/25/19. It should have been served by 10/21/19 to account 16 court days of notice increased by five calendar days for service by mail. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1005(b).

The Notice, Declaration, and Proposed Order is required to be prepared on Judicial Council Form. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(a).

There is only a proof of service showing that the Notice of Motion (on pleading paper) was served. There is no evidence that a Declaration and fully completed Proposed Order was served on the parties. There is no evidence that counsel lodged a fully prepared proposed order.

Counsel is ordered to comply with Cal Rules of Court 3.1362.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC690024    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 2

Robertson v. Starbucks Corporation

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Carol Robertson is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR.

Plaintiff’s counsel filed a proof of service showing that Notice of Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record was served by mail on 10/25/19. It should have been served by 10/21/19 to account 16 court days of notice increased by five calendar days for service by mail. Cal Code Civil Procedure § 1005(b).

The Notice, Declaration, and Proposed Order is required to be prepared on Judicial Council Form. Cal Rules of Court 3.1362(a).

There is only a proof of service showing that the Notice of Motion (on pleading paper) was served. There is no evidence that a Declaration and fully completed Proposed Order was served on the parties. There is no evidence that counsel lodged a fully prepared proposed order.

Counsel is ordered to comply with Cal Rules of Court 3.1362.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC690024    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: 2

Robertson v. Starbucks Corporation, et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Carol Robertson is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR. A proof of service is not attached to the motion showing when the Defendant and Plaintiff were served with the motion.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.