This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/31/2020 at 14:49:20 (UTC).

CAROLYN ECHEVERRIA VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 CAROLYN ECHEVERRIA filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, SAMANTHA JESSNER and BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3085

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ECHEVERRIA CAROLYN

ECHEVERRIA MYRAYA

FRETTON MARGOT

ECHEVERRIA FRED

Defendants

LOS ANGELES COUNTY

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIVENS DERMOT DAMIAN

GIVENS DERMOT D.

Defendant Attorneys

WEISS DAVID JAY

WEISS DAVID J.

TJOENG A. TRACY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

1/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

1/23/2020: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO 2ND AMEND COMPLAINT

1/27/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO 2ND AMEND COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

1/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO P...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO P...)

Request for Judicial Notice

11/18/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTY RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER RE: OPERATIVE COMPLAINT

11/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ATTY RE: GOOD FAITH ATTEMPT TO MEET AND CONFER RE: OPERATIVE COMPLAINT

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/18/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/6/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

10/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/8/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/15/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND

10/18/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO P...)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO P...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

10/3/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MSJ

10/1/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MSJ

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

9/11/2019: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder (Of Dismissal); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Carolyn Echeverria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketOpposition (to demurrer to 2nd amend complaint); Filed by Carolyn Echeverria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) to P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Newly Filed Class Action;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 04/23/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Carolyn Echeverria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Carolyn Echeverria (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Carolyn Echeverria (Plaintiff); Margot Fretton (Plaintiff); Myraya Echeverria (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint ( (2nd)); Filed by Carolyn Echeverria (Plaintiff); Margot Fretton (Plaintiff); Myraya Echeverria (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIVENS DERMOT DAMIAN