This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 00:36:51 (UTC).

CAROLINE TRAN NGUYEN VS ALFRED BEN TAMIR D D S ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice case was filed by CAROLINE TRAN NGUYEN against ALFRED BEN TAMIR D D S in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3195

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TRAN-NGUYEN CAROLINE

Defendants and Respondents

PAZ AND TAMIR DENTAL CORPORATION

DOES 1-20

PAZ BABAK AARON D.D.S.

ALFRED TAMIR D.D.S. INC.

ATLANTIC DENTAL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

4/23/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

4/23/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Babak Aaron D.D.S. Paz (Defendant); Paz And Tamir Dental Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Alfred Ben D.D.S. Tamir (Defendant); Alfred Tamir, D.D.S., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DEFENDANTS' ANSWFR TO COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Alfred Ben D.D.S. Tamir (Defendant); Alfred Tamir, D.D.S., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by Babak Aaron D.D.S. Paz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Caroline Tran-Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Caroline Tran-Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Caroline Tran-Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Caroline Tran-Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Caroline Tran-Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Caroline Tran-Nguyen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703195    Hearing Date: October 28, 2019    Dept: 2

Nguyen v. Tamir, DDS, et al.

Motion to be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff, Caroline Tran Nguyen, filed on 8/20/19, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. Plaintiff has not cited any authority that would permit the court to force counsel to provide services to a client who counsel believes he can no longer represent.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.