This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 02:58:02 (UTC).

CAROLINE SPARKS VS STARLAKE FUND LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 CAROLINE SPARKS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STARLAKE FUND LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8268

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SPARKS CAROLINE

Defendants

ANGELENE APARTMENTS AN UNKNOWN ENTITY

STARLAKE FUND LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ANGELENE APARTMENTS OWNER LLC

JP MORGAN INV MANAGEMENT INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/15/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/15/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • Hearing02/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 57 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Caroline Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Caroline Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Caroline Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Caroline Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Caroline Sparks (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ANGELENE APARTMENT OWNER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH