This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2021 at 13:51:04 (UTC).

CAROLINE PEARL SASOONES VS SAMANTHA JADE HURWITZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 CAROLINE PEARL SASOONES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SAMANTHA JADE HURWITZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6083

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SASOONES CAROLINE PEARL

Defendants

HURWITZ JEREMY

HURWITZ SAMANTHA JADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMINGO MICHAEL DOMINGO

Defendant Attorney

ADEM STEPHANIE N.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/15/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/21/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

8/25/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

8/25/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2024
  • Hearing07/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Hearing01/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Hearing12/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Samantha Jade Hurwitz (Defendant); Jeremy Hurwitz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Samantha Jade Hurwitz (Defendant); Jeremy Hurwitz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Samantha Jade Hurwitz (Defendant); Jeremy Hurwitz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Caroline Pearl Sasoones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Caroline Pearl Sasoones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Caroline Pearl Sasoones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Caroline Pearl Sasoones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Caroline Pearl Sasoones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Caroline Pearl Sasoones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOMINGO MICHAEL DOMINGO