This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 05:19:12 (UTC).

CAROLINA URIBE VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/09/2021 CAROLINA URIBE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1344

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

URIBE CAROLINA

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARR ROBERT L.

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS STACEY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/13/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by GENERAL MOTORS LLC, a Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by CAROLINA URIBE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by CAROLINA URIBE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by CAROLINA URIBE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by CAROLINA URIBE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STARR ROBERT LORNE